THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:57:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Oct 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ayesha Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ahmed (CPSO#: 123232 )
Business Address: 647-613-7484

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Oct 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ayesha Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ahmed (CPSO#: 123232 )
Business Address: 647-613-7484

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYESHA MUHAMMAD AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYESHA MUHAMMAD AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Oct 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2021