THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:18:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Meadowglen Medical Centre
9-10 Meadowglen Dr
Whitby Ontario L1R 3P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. AL-BAYATTI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Al-Bayatti (CPSO#: 123263 )
Business Address: 10 Meadowglen Dr
Whitby ON L1R 3P8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Meadowglen Medical Centre
9-10 Meadowglen Dr
Whitby Ontario L1R 3P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. AL-BAYATTI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Al-Bayatti (CPSO#: 123263 )
Business Address: 10 Meadowglen Dr
Whitby ON L1R 3P8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAAD NAJEM ABDULLAH AL-BAYATTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-BAYATTI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAAD NAJEM ABDULLAH AL-BAYATTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-BAYATTI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Feb 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Feb 2021