THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:05:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México Facultad de Medicina, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 303-180 Vine St S
St. Catharines ON L2R 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-362-5524
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Sep 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 16 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. MONCAYO DE LAPENSEE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Moncayo De Lapensee (CPSO#: 123276 )
Business Address: 302-180 Vine St S
St Catharines ON L2R 7P3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México Facultad de Medicina, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 303-180 Vine St S
St. Catharines ON L2R 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-362-5524
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Sep 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 16 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. MONCAYO DE LAPENSEE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Moncayo De Lapensee (CPSO#: 123276 )
Business Address: 302-180 Vine St S
St Catharines ON L2R 7P3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEJANDRA MONCAYO DE LAPENSEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONCAYO DE LAPENSEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEJANDRA MONCAYO DE LAPENSEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONCAYO DE LAPENSEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México Facultad de Medicina, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2020