THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:38:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Doneck Medical University, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Ross Ave E
Timmins ON P4N 8P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 267-2131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 01 Nov 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul S.K. Glover Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Glover (CPSO#: 123303 )
Business Address: 700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
(705)267-2131

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Doneck Medical University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Ross Ave E
Timmins ON P4N 8P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 267-2131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 01 Nov 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul S.K. Glover Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Glover (CPSO#: 123303 )
Business Address: 700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
(705)267-2131

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Nov 2023
30 Jun 2030
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 01 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2030
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. PAUL SEDEM KOMLA GLOVER may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Emergency Medicine, Division of Clinical Sciences, Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. GLOVER holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. GLOVER no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. GLOVER’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. GLOVER’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 November, 2023, and expires on 30 June, 2030. Upon renewal of Dr. GLOVER's academic appointment at the Northern Ontario School of Medicine, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. PAUL SEDEM KOMLA GLOVER may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Emergency Medicine, Division of Clinical Sciences, Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. GLOVER holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. GLOVER no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. GLOVER’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. GLOVER’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 November, 2023, and expires on 30 June, 2030. Upon renewal of Dr. GLOVER's academic appointment at the Northern Ontario School of Medicine, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Doneck Medical University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2030

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2021