THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:21:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 16-2555 Erin Centre Blvd
Credit Valley Health Centre
Mississauga ON L5M 5H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-828-0270
Fax: 905-828-0277

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MOHAMMED IMANA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Imana (CPSO#: 123324 )
Business Address: 5193 Forest Hill Dr
Mississauga ON L5M 5A5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 16-2555 Erin Centre Blvd
Credit Valley Health Centre
Mississauga ON L5M 5H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-828-0270
Fax: 905-828-0277

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MOHAMMED IMANA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Imana (CPSO#: 123324 )
Business Address: 5193 Forest Hill Dr
Mississauga ON L5M 5A5

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
06 Oct 2020
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 06 2020
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MOHAMMED MARUFU IMANA may practise medicine independently in family medicine, excluding emergency medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MOHAMMED MARUFU IMANA may practise medicine independently in family medicine, excluding emergency medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Oct 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Oct 2020