THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:18:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9135 Keele St
Clarity Eye Institute
Ophthalmology
Concord ON L4K 0J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-663=3937
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Western Eye Care Center
3 Herald Avenue
Corner Brook NL A2H 4B8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 38 Church St
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Ophthalmology Clinic
Markham ON L3P 2L8
Phone: (905) 472-7373
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 18 Wynford Dr
North York Eye Associates
North York ON M3C 3S2
Phone: 416-494-7455
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 22 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andre Ali-Ridha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ali-Ridha (CPSO#: 123378 )
Business Address: 9135 Keele Street
A7
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0J4
514-585-2374

Corporation Name: Dr. Andre Ali-Ridha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Mar 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9135 Keele St
Clarity Eye Institute
Ophthalmology
Concord ON L4K 0J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-663=3937
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Western Eye Care Center
3 Herald Avenue
Corner Brook NL A2H 4B8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 38 Church St
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Ophthalmology Clinic
Markham ON L3P 2L8
Phone: (905) 472-7373
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 18 Wynford Dr
North York Eye Associates
North York ON M3C 3S2
Phone: 416-494-7455
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 22 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andre Ali-Ridha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ali-Ridha (CPSO#: 123378 )
Business Address: 9135 Keele Street
A7
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0J4
514-585-2374

Corporation Name: Dr. Andre Ali-Ridha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Mar 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDRE NIHAD ALI-RIDHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI-RIDHA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDRE NIHAD ALI-RIDHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI-RIDHA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2021