THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:51:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 157 Queen St E
Brampton ON L6W 3X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054577566
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason Shafiat Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ali (CPSO#: 123379 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 157 Queen St E
Brampton ON L6W 3X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054577566
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason Shafiat Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ali (CPSO#: 123379 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
26 Apr 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 26 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JASON SHAFIAT ALI may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JASON SHAFIAT ALI may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Apr 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 May 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 May 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Dec 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Dec 2020