THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:20:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4903 Thomas Alton Boulevard
Unit 104
Burlington Ontario L7M 0W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 336-6102
Fax: 289-714-2652
Address: 4903 Thomas Alton Blvd
Unit 104
Burlington ON L7M 0W8
Phone: (905) 336-6102
Fax: 289-714-2652

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Nov 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Preeti Wadhwa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Wadhwa (CPSO#: 123421 )
Business Address: 204-490 Bramalea Rd
Brampton ON L6T 0G1
905-792-6500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4903 Thomas Alton Boulevard
Unit 104
Burlington Ontario L7M 0W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 336-6102
Fax: 289-714-2652
Address: 4903 Thomas Alton Blvd
Unit 104
Burlington ON L7M 0W8
Phone: (905) 336-6102
Fax: 289-714-2652

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Nov 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Preeti Wadhwa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Wadhwa (CPSO#: 123421 )
Business Address: 204-490 Bramalea Rd
Brampton ON L6T 0G1
905-792-6500

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
07 Oct 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 07 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. PREETI WADHWA may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. PREETI WADHWA may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Oct 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Oct 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Mar 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 2020