THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:11:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stockyards Medical
1980 St Clair Ave W
Toronto ON M6N 0A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 901-9880
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 302-2318 Lake Shore Blvd W
Stockyards Akron Medical Centre
3rd Floor
Etobicoke ON M8V 1B5
Phone: (416) 252-6701
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4A-2200 Dundas St E
Mississauga ON L4X 2V3
Phone: 9052320730
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Solademi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Solademi (CPSO#: 123445 )
Business Address: 203-1980 St Clair Ave W
Toronto ON M6N 0A3
(416) 901-9880

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stockyards Medical
1980 St Clair Ave W
Toronto ON M6N 0A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 901-9880
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 302-2318 Lake Shore Blvd W
Stockyards Akron Medical Centre
3rd Floor
Etobicoke ON M8V 1B5
Phone: (416) 252-6701
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4A-2200 Dundas St E
Mississauga ON L4X 2V3
Phone: 9052320730
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Solademi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Solademi (CPSO#: 123445 )
Business Address: 203-1980 St Clair Ave W
Toronto ON M6N 0A3
(416) 901-9880

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AKINNIYI OLUSEYI SOLADEMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLADEMI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AKINNIYI OLUSEYI SOLADEMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLADEMI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2021