THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:24:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville Ontario L6H 3P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-844-3281
Fax: 905-849-1076

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Apr 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 11 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K Nath-Strisiver Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Nath-Strisiver (CPSO#: 123446 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville Ontario L6H 3P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-844-3281
Fax: 905-849-1076

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Apr 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 11 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K Nath-Strisiver Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Nath-Strisiver (CPSO#: 123446 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN INDIRA NATH-STRISIVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NATH-STRISIVER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN INDIRA NATH-STRISIVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NATH-STRISIVER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2021