THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:02:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056847271
Fax: 905-684-6411
Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4K9
Phone: 519-749-4300
Extension: 5110
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waterloo Regional Health Network Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Waterloo Regional Health Network
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anmol Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gupta (CPSO#: 123449 )
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
905-378-4647 Extn: 46412

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056847271
Fax: 905-684-6411
Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4K9
Phone: 519-749-4300
Extension: 5110
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waterloo Regional Health Network Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Waterloo Regional Health Network
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anmol Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gupta (CPSO#: 123449 )
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
905-378-4647 Extn: 46412

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANMOL PANKAJ GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANMOL PANKAJ GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Mar 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Feb 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Sep 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Feb 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Dec 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2020