THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:54:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Appletree Medical Centre
Division of Family Medicine
100 - 2025 Midland Ave
Toronto Ontario M1P 3E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647 722 2370
Fax: 647 490 6330

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MAYOORI THINAKARAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Thinakaran (CPSO#: 123480 )
Business Address: 100-2025 Midland Ave
Scarborough ON M1P 3E2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Appletree Medical Centre
Division of Family Medicine
100 - 2025 Midland Ave
Toronto Ontario M1P 3E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647 722 2370
Fax: 647 490 6330

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MAYOORI THINAKARAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Thinakaran (CPSO#: 123480 )
Business Address: 100-2025 Midland Ave
Scarborough ON M1P 3E2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAYOORI THINAKARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THINAKARAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAYOORI THINAKARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THINAKARAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Dec 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Dec 2020