THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:24:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Avalon University School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 37 The Links Rd
Bayview Medical Centre
North York ON M2P 1T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 730-1212
Fax: (416) 730-1216

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Nov 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pejman Jamkhou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Jamkhou (CPSO#: 123489 )
Business Address: 37 The Links Rd
Bayview Medical Centre
North York ON M2P 1T7
(416) 730-1212

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Avalon University School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 37 The Links Rd
Bayview Medical Centre
North York ON M2P 1T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 730-1212
Fax: (416) 730-1216

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Nov 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pejman Jamkhou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Jamkhou (CPSO#: 123489 )
Business Address: 37 The Links Rd
Bayview Medical Centre
North York ON M2P 1T7
(416) 730-1212

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PEJMAN JAMKHOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMKHOU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PEJMAN JAMKHOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMKHOU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Avalon University School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2020