THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 02:49:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: Roy Chowdhury, Apala (Used Until: 03 Oct 2020)
Medical School: Manipal Academy of Higher Education, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
department of Anesthesiology
Victoria hospital, LHSC
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519685850019306
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 13 Jan 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 13 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: APALA ROY CHOWDHURY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chowdhury (CPSO#: 123511 )
Business Address: 505 Talbot Street
Suite 705
London Ontario N6A 2S6
4372217006

General Information

Former Name: Roy Chowdhury, Apala (Used Until: 03 Oct 2020)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Manipal Academy of Higher Education, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
department of Anesthesiology
Victoria hospital, LHSC
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519685850019306
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 13 Jan 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 13 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: APALA ROY CHOWDHURY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chowdhury (CPSO#: 123511 )
Business Address: 505 Talbot Street
Suite 705
London Ontario N6A 2S6
4372217006

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
13 Jan 2024
30 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 13 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. APALA ROY CHOWDHURY may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Anesthesia and Perioperative Medicine, Western University, in which Dr. CHOWDHURY holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. CHOWDHURY no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. CHOWDHURY’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. CHOWDHURY’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 13 January, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. CHOWDHURY's academic appointment at Western University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. APALA ROY CHOWDHURY may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Anesthesia and Perioperative Medicine, Western University, in which Dr. CHOWDHURY holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. CHOWDHURY no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. CHOWDHURY’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. CHOWDHURY’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 13 January, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. CHOWDHURY's academic appointment at Western University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Manipal Academy of Higher Education, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Jan 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Feb 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 2021