THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:10:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dr. N.T.R University of Health Sciences, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5-2730 Iris St
PulsePoint Medical Center
Ottawa ON K2C 1E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 343-801-5323
Fax: 833-466-0666
Address: 1A-2-1595 Merivale Rd
Nepean ON K2G 3J4
Phone: (613) 482-0118
Fax: (613) 604-0277

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Nov 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MEGJHANI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Megjhani (CPSO#: 123535 )
Business Address: 2948 Baseline Rd
Nepean ON K2H 8T5
6134820118

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dr. N.T.R University of Health Sciences, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5-2730 Iris St
PulsePoint Medical Center
Ottawa ON K2C 1E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 343-801-5323
Fax: 833-466-0666
Address: 1A-2-1595 Merivale Rd
Nepean ON K2G 3J4
Phone: (613) 482-0118
Fax: (613) 604-0277

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Nov 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MEGJHANI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Megjhani (CPSO#: 123535 )
Business Address: 2948 Baseline Rd
Nepean ON K2H 8T5
6134820118

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 May 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 25 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MALIK MEGJHANI may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MALIK MEGJHANI may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dr. N.T.R University of Health Sciences, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 31 Aug 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 May 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Mar 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 May 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2020