THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:47:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Goa Medical College, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 115 Delhi St
Guelph General Hospital
Guelph ON N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 125 Delhi St
Guelph ON N1E 4J5
Phone: 6479528527
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 02 Jun 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SINGH HURA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hura (CPSO#: 123556 )
Business Address: 125 Delhi St
4-46
Guelph ON N1E 4J5
6477401703

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Goa Medical College, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 115 Delhi St
Guelph General Hospital
Guelph ON N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 125 Delhi St
Guelph ON N1E 4J5
Phone: 6479528527
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 02 Jun 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SINGH HURA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hura (CPSO#: 123556 )
Business Address: 125 Delhi St
4-46
Guelph ON N1E 4J5
6477401703

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
11 Apr 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 11 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. KANWALJEET SINGH HURA may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. KANWALJEET SINGH HURA may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Goa Medical College, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Apr 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 28 Sep 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jan 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2020