THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:24:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sind Medical College, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4265 Thomas Alton Boulevard
Unit 4
Burlington Ontario L7M 0Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053352577
Fax: 2897142699

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Aug 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 15 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SAAD YASIN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Yasin (CPSO#: 123583 )
Business Address: 4-4265 Thomas Alton Blvd
Burlington ON L7M 0Z4
9053352577

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Sind Medical College, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4265 Thomas Alton Boulevard
Unit 4
Burlington Ontario L7M 0Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053352577
Fax: 2897142699

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Aug 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 15 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SAAD YASIN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Yasin (CPSO#: 123583 )
Business Address: 4-4265 Thomas Alton Blvd
Burlington ON L7M 0Z4
9053352577

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
03 Mar 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 03 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SAAD YASIN may practise medicine independently in family medicine, only.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SAAD YASIN may practise medicine independently in family medicine, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sind Medical College, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2021