THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:26:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: First Moscow State Medical University, 2004
Gender: Prefer not to answer
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 117-1060 Speers Rd
Oakville ON L6L 2X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)845-8884
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
William Osler Health System - Brampton Civic Hospital
Medical Oncology - Survivorship Team
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Oct 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aneet Hooda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hooda (CPSO#: 123584 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Prefer not to answer
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: First Moscow State Medical University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 117-1060 Speers Rd
Oakville ON L6L 2X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)845-8884
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
William Osler Health System - Brampton Civic Hospital
Medical Oncology - Survivorship Team
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Oct 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aneet Hooda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hooda (CPSO#: 123584 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANEET HOODA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOODA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANEET HOODA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOODA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: First Moscow State Medical University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Oct 2020