THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:34:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College, Cork, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 304 Victoria Avenue North
301-304 Victoria Ave N
Hamilton Ontario L8L 5G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 529-5221
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Haikalis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Haikalis (CPSO#: 123829 )
Business Address: M1-414 Victoria Ave N
Hamilton ON L8L 5G8
9055295221
Business Address: 304 Victoria Avenue North
#301
Hamilton Ontario L8L 5G4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College, Cork, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 304 Victoria Avenue North
301-304 Victoria Ave N
Hamilton Ontario L8L 5G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 529-5221
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Haikalis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Haikalis (CPSO#: 123829 )
Business Address: M1-414 Victoria Ave N
Hamilton ON L8L 5G8
9055295221
Business Address: 304 Victoria Avenue North
#301
Hamilton Ontario L8L 5G4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCOS NICOLAS HAIKALIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIKALIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCOS NICOLAS HAIKALIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIKALIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College, Cork, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2021