THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:38:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10-1275 Walker Rd
Tecumseh-Byng Clinic
Windsor ON N8Y 4X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital Metropolitan Campus
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Phone: 226 210 5566
Fax: 226 216 5296
Address: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Phone: 2262105566
Fax: 2262165296

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 02 Aug 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Mar 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 02 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 12 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Abraham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Abraham (CPSO#: 123909 )
Business Address: 1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Business Address: 10-1275 Walker Rd
Windsor ON N8Y 4X9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10-1275 Walker Rd
Tecumseh-Byng Clinic
Windsor ON N8Y 4X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital Metropolitan Campus
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Phone: 226 210 5566
Fax: 226 216 5296
Address: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Phone: 2262105566
Fax: 2262165296

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 02 Aug 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Mar 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 02 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 12 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Abraham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Abraham (CPSO#: 123909 )
Business Address: 1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Business Address: 10-1275 Walker Rd
Windsor ON N8Y 4X9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL SEBASTIAN ABRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABRAHAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL SEBASTIAN ABRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABRAHAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2020