THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 16:03:05 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Trinity School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Regional Hospital
Internal Medicine
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5192545577
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Regional Hospital - Ouellette Campus
Windsor Ontario N9A 1H9
Phone: 5192545577
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2464 Howard Avenue
Clinic
Suite 202
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Phone: 5192529861
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven Douglas Kirby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kirby (CPSO#: 123941 )
Business Address: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1H9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Trinity School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Regional Hospital
Internal Medicine
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5192545577
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Regional Hospital - Ouellette Campus
Windsor Ontario N9A 1H9
Phone: 5192545577
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2464 Howard Avenue
Clinic
Suite 202
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Phone: 5192529861
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven Douglas Kirby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kirby (CPSO#: 123941 )
Business Address: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1H9

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
20 Sep 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 20 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. STEVEN DOUGLAS KIRBY may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. STEVEN DOUGLAS KIRBY may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Trinity School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2023