THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:32:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Nishtar Medical College, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Hospital - Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital - Ouellette Campus
1330 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Aug 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: NAUMAN IFTIKHAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Iftikhar (CPSO#: 123973 )
Business Address: 70 Augustus Crt
Lasalle ON N9H 0G6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Nishtar Medical College, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Hospital - Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital - Ouellette Campus
1330 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Aug 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: NAUMAN IFTIKHAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Iftikhar (CPSO#: 123973 )
Business Address: 70 Augustus Crt
Lasalle ON N9H 0G6

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
18 Jul 2024
15 Aug 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 18 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Aug 15 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. NAUMAN IFTIKHAR may practise anesthesiology with the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Windsor Regional Hospital - Metropolitan Campus in Windsor, Ontario; and

(ii) Windsor Regional Hospital - Ouellette Campus in Windsor, Ontario.

2. The certificate of registration will automatically expire on 15 August, 2025, or when Dr. IFTIKHAR’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. IFTIKHAR’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. IFTIKHAR's practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 19 August, 2022, and will expire on or before 15 August, 2025, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. NAUMAN IFTIKHAR may practise anesthesiology with the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Windsor Regional Hospital - Metropolitan Campus in Windsor, Ontario; and

(ii) Windsor Regional Hospital - Ouellette Campus in Windsor, Ontario.

2. The certificate of registration will automatically expire on 15 August, 2025, or when Dr. IFTIKHAR’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. IFTIKHAR’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. IFTIKHAR's practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 19 August, 2022, and will expire on or before 15 August, 2025, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Nishtar Medical College, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Jul 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jan 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 15 Aug 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Jan 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2021