THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:52:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kwame Nkrumah University of Sc & Tech, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AKAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Princess Anne Drive
Halton Healthcare Services
Halton Hills Ontario L7G 2B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 873 0111
Fax: 905 873 4574
Address: 199 Princess Anne Drive
Halton Hills Ontario L7G 0E3
Phone: 9058733000
Fax: 905 873 0800
Address: 400-20 14 Street West
Prince Albert Saskatchewan S6V 3K8
Phone: 9058733000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. PAUL ACHEAMPONG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Acheampong (CPSO#: 124008 )
Business Address: 725 Bronte St S
Milton District Hosptal
Dept of Medicine
Milton ON L9T 9K1
Business Address: 1 Princess Anne Dr
Georgetown ON L7G 2B8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AKAN
Medical School: Kwame Nkrumah University of Sc & Tech, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Princess Anne Drive
Halton Healthcare Services
Halton Hills Ontario L7G 2B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 873 0111
Fax: 905 873 4574
Address: 199 Princess Anne Drive
Halton Hills Ontario L7G 0E3
Phone: 9058733000
Fax: 905 873 0800
Address: 400-20 14 Street West
Prince Albert Saskatchewan S6V 3K8
Phone: 9058733000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. PAUL ACHEAMPONG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Acheampong (CPSO#: 124008 )
Business Address: 725 Bronte St S
Milton District Hosptal
Dept of Medicine
Milton ON L9T 9K1
Business Address: 1 Princess Anne Dr
Georgetown ON L7G 2B8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL ACHEAMPONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ACHEAMPONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL ACHEAMPONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ACHEAMPONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kwame Nkrumah University of Sc & Tech, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2020