THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:18:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 5A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Extension: 48916
Fax: 2893819064

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. Genevieve Dostaler MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Dostaler (CPSO#: 124045 )
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 5A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Extension: 48916
Fax: 2893819064

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. Genevieve Dostaler MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Dostaler (CPSO#: 124045 )
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE DOSTALER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOSTALER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE DOSTALER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOSTALER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Nov 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2020