THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 07:50:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: West Virginia School of Osteopathic Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 06 Feb 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 06 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ramachandran & Karunakaran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Karunakaran (CPSO#: 127763 ) Dr. R. Ramachandran (CPSO#: 124123 )
Business Address: 1723 Kipling Avenue
Toronto Ontario M9R 4E1
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: West Virginia School of Osteopathic Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 06 Feb 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 06 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ramachandran & Karunakaran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Karunakaran (CPSO#: 127763 ) Dr. R. Ramachandran (CPSO#: 124123 )
Business Address: 1723 Kipling Avenue
Toronto Ontario M9R 4E1
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 May 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 25 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. REGGIE NARAYANAN RAMACHANDRAN may practise medicine independently in emergency medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. REGGIE NARAYANAN RAMACHANDRAN may practise medicine independently in emergency medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: West Virginia School of Osteopathic Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 May 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 May 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 05 Aug 2025