THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:10:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: Walenczykiewicz, Kamilla (Used Until: 10 Feb 2022)
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: KJK Medical Clinic
1100 Dundas St W
Mississauga ON L5C 4E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8-51 Mountainash Rd
Urgent Care Centre
Brampton ON L6R 1W4
Phone: 905-799-2971
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8-10088 McLaughlin Rd
Urgent Care Centre
Brampton ON L7A 2X6
Phone: 905-799-2971
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10-25 Woodbine Downs Blvd
Urgent Care Centre
Etobicoke ON M9W 6N5
Phone: 416-741-2273
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4-1100 Dundas St W
KJK Healthplex
Mississauga ON L5C 4E7
Phone: 4165304966
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2-4000 Highway 7
Urgent Care Centre
Woodbridge ON L4L 8Z2
Phone: 905-851-3777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Nastasi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Nastasi (CPSO#: 124130 )
Business Address: 1100 Dundas Street West
Unit 7-8
Mississauga Ontario L5C 4E7
4165304966

General Information

Former Name: Walenczykiewicz, Kamilla (Used Until: 10 Feb 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: KJK Medical Clinic
1100 Dundas St W
Mississauga ON L5C 4E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8-51 Mountainash Rd
Urgent Care Centre
Brampton ON L6R 1W4
Phone: 905-799-2971
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8-10088 McLaughlin Rd
Urgent Care Centre
Brampton ON L7A 2X6
Phone: 905-799-2971
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10-25 Woodbine Downs Blvd
Urgent Care Centre
Etobicoke ON M9W 6N5
Phone: 416-741-2273
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4-1100 Dundas St W
KJK Healthplex
Mississauga ON L5C 4E7
Phone: 4165304966
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2-4000 Highway 7
Urgent Care Centre
Woodbridge ON L4L 8Z2
Phone: 905-851-3777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Nastasi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Nastasi (CPSO#: 124130 )
Business Address: 1100 Dundas Street West
Unit 7-8
Mississauga Ontario L5C 4E7
4165304966

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAMILLA NASTASI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASTASI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAMILLA NASTASI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASTASI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2021