THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:00:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 311-85 Norfolk St
Guelph ON N1H 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 836-7861
Fax: (519) 836-8842

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Nov 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.A. Shaw Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shaw (CPSO#: 124198 )
Business Address: 113 Poplar Dr
Cambridge ON N3C 4A8
Business Address: 59 Stirling Macgregor Dr
Cambridge ON N1S 4N4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 311-85 Norfolk St
Guelph ON N1H 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 836-7861
Fax: (519) 836-8842

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Nov 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.A. Shaw Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shaw (CPSO#: 124198 )
Business Address: 113 Poplar Dr
Cambridge ON N3C 4A8
Business Address: 59 Stirling Macgregor Dr
Cambridge ON N1S 4N4

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 Nov 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 25 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MATTHEW ALLAN SHAW may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MATTHEW ALLAN SHAW may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Nov 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2021