THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:31:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of London, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Avenue
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 17886
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 501 Smyth Road
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Phone: (613) 737-8187
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
Ottawa Ontario K1H 1B9
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 18 Apr 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 18 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philip S. Jones Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Jones (CPSO#: 124230 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond St
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Address: 3774 Revelstoke Drive
Ottawa
K1V 7C4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of London, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Avenue
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 17886
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 501 Smyth Road
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Phone: (613) 737-8187
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
Ottawa Ontario K1H 1B9
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 18 Apr 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 18 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philip S. Jones Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Jones (CPSO#: 124230 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond St
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Address: 3774 Revelstoke Drive
Ottawa
K1V 7C4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIP STUART JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIP STUART JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of London, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Apr 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Aug 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2021