THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 06:26:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Madras Medical College, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SHYAM KUMAR RAVISANKAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ravisankar (CPSO#: 124245 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
DEPT OF ONCOLOGY
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Address: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Madras Medical College, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SHYAM KUMAR RAVISANKAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ravisankar (CPSO#: 124245 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
DEPT OF ONCOLOGY
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Address: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
09 Aug 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 09 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SHYAM KUMAR RAVISANKAR may practise medicine independently in hematology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SHYAM KUMAR RAVISANKAR may practise medicine independently in hematology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Madras Medical College, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2022
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2021