THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:37:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 79 Fifth Ave
Sioux Lookout ON P8T 1K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8077373808
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PAGE BROOKS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Brooks (CPSO#: 124290 )
Business Address: 21 Government Row
Sioux Lookout ON P8T 1E6
4039887450

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 79 Fifth Ave
Sioux Lookout ON P8T 1K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8077373808
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PAGE BROOKS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Brooks (CPSO#: 124290 )
Business Address: 21 Government Row
Sioux Lookout ON P8T 1E6
4039887450

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAGE JANINE BROOKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROOKS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAGE JANINE BROOKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROOKS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2020