THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:28:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Apr 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Apr 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 26 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 26 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chankalal Professional Services Inc.
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chankalal (CPSO#: 124341 )
Business Address: 115-74 Curlew Dr
North York ON M3A 2R3
316-312-5781

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Apr 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Apr 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 26 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 26 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chankalal Professional Services Inc.
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chankalal (CPSO#: 124341 )
Business Address: 115-74 Curlew Dr
North York ON M3A 2R3
316-312-5781

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
26 Jan 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 26 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. RAYMOND R CHANKALAL may practise medicine independently in psychiatry and child and adolescent psychiatry.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. RAYMOND R CHANKALAL may practise medicine independently in psychiatry and child and adolescent psychiatry.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Jan 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Sep 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2021