THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:34:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 725 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 9K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Princess Anne Dr
Georgetown ON L7G 2B8
Phone: (905) 873-0111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MINA FAHEIM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Faheim (CPSO#: 124445 )
Business Address: 725 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 9K1
(905) 878-2383

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 725 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 9K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Princess Anne Dr
Georgetown ON L7G 2B8
Phone: (905) 873-0111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MINA FAHEIM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Faheim (CPSO#: 124445 )
Business Address: 725 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 9K1
(905) 878-2383

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MINA FAHEIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAHEIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MINA FAHEIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAHEIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Dec 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2020