THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:50:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury ON K6A 3G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6136321111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 420-900 Boul Du Séminaire N
Saint-Jean-Sur-Richelieu QC J3A 1C3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: EMILE SALIBA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Saliba (CPSO#: 124504 )
Business Address: 1111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury ON K6A 3G5
514-244-1473
Business Address: 1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury General Hospital
Cardiology
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3G5
6136321111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, SPANISH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury ON K6A 3G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6136321111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 420-900 Boul Du Séminaire N
Saint-Jean-Sur-Richelieu QC J3A 1C3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: EMILE SALIBA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Saliba (CPSO#: 124504 )
Business Address: 1111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury ON K6A 3G5
514-244-1473
Business Address: 1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury General Hospital
Cardiology
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3G5
6136321111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILE SALIBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALIBA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILE SALIBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALIBA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2021