THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:44:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: Gabreil, Abdurrazig Abdalla Hussain (Used Until: 17 Dec 2020) Gabreil, Abdurrazig (Used Until: 17 Nov 2020)
Medical School: Garyounis University, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: York health choice centre
605 Rogers road , unit D5
Toronto ON M6M 1B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166567272
Fax: 4166564646
Address: Health Choice Centre
815 College St, Main floor
Toronto ON M6G 1C9
Phone: (416) 533-1145
Fax: (416) 533-3918

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.Haider Medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Haider (CPSO#: 124509 )
Business Address: D5-605 Rogers Rd
York ON M6M 1B9

General Information

Former Name: Gabreil, Abdurrazig Abdalla Hussain (Used Until: 17 Dec 2020) Gabreil, Abdurrazig (Used Until: 17 Nov 2020)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Garyounis University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: York health choice centre
605 Rogers road , unit D5
Toronto ON M6M 1B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166567272
Fax: 4166564646
Address: Health Choice Centre
815 College St, Main floor
Toronto ON M6G 1C9
Phone: (416) 533-1145
Fax: (416) 533-3918

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.Haider Medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Haider (CPSO#: 124509 )
Business Address: D5-605 Rogers Rd
York ON M6M 1B9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDURRAZIG HAIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIDER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDURRAZIG HAIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIDER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Garyounis University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2021