THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:52:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Aga Khan University Medical College, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th St E
Suite 7300
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193715809
Fax: 5193710404

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 08 Dec 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. AYESHA NAEEM MEDICAL PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Naeem (CPSO#: 124540 )
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Suite 7300
Annan Ontario N0H 1B0
8329685077

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Aga Khan University Medical College, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th St E
Suite 7300
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193715809
Fax: 5193710404

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 08 Dec 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. AYESHA NAEEM MEDICAL PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Naeem (CPSO#: 124540 )
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Suite 7300
Annan Ontario N0H 1B0
8329685077

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
11 Dec 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 11 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. AYESHA NAEEM may practise medicine independently in neurology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. AYESHA NAEEM may practise medicine independently in neurology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Aga Khan University Medical College, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2023