THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:39:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1A-9 Progress Ave
Scarborough ON M1P 5A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-350-6662
Fax: 647 349 6662

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Lui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lui (CPSO#: 124561 )
Business Address: 1-9 Progress Ave
Scarborough ON M1P 5A4
6473506662

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1A-9 Progress Ave
Scarborough ON M1P 5A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-350-6662
Fax: 647 349 6662

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Lui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lui (CPSO#: 124561 )
Business Address: 1-9 Progress Ave
Scarborough ON M1P 5A4
6473506662

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER LUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER LUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2020