THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:48:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Lagos, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5-50 Rolling Hills Dr
Orangeville ON L9W 6T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193070075
Fax: 5193070085

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Feb 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 14 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adefarati Ajayi Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ajayi (CPSO#: 124563 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Lagos, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5-50 Rolling Hills Dr
Orangeville ON L9W 6T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193070075
Fax: 5193070085

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Feb 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 14 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adefarati Ajayi Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ajayi (CPSO#: 124563 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADEFARATI KABIR AJAYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AJAYI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADEFARATI KABIR AJAYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AJAYI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Lagos, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 May 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 May 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 May 2021