THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:47:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Agincourt Medical Centre
2020 Brimley Rd
Scarborough ON M1S 4R7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Mar 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 05 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Giorgos Bidales Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bidales (CPSO#: 124599 )
Business Address: 2020 Brimley Rd
Scarborough ON M1S 4R7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Agincourt Medical Centre
2020 Brimley Rd
Scarborough ON M1S 4R7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Mar 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 05 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Giorgos Bidales Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bidales (CPSO#: 124599 )
Business Address: 2020 Brimley Rd
Scarborough ON M1S 4R7

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
13 Oct 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 13 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. GIORGOS KOSMAS BIDALES may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. GIORGOS KOSMAS BIDALES may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Oct 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Aug 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 2021