THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:06:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 968 St. Laurent Blvd
Ottawa ON K1K 3B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 968 St. Laurent Blvd
Ottawa ON K1K 3B3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2330 Carling Ave
Carlingview Manor Nursing Home
Ottawa ON K2B 7H1
Phone: 6138209328
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Aird Place
Ottawa Ontario K2L 4H8
Phone: 1-613-254-9702
Fax: 1-613-254-9743

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Mar 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Omar Alsaffar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Alsaffar (CPSO#: 124621 )
Business Address: 968 St. Laurent Blvd
Ottawa ON K1K 3B3
613 789 4385

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 968 St. Laurent Blvd
Ottawa ON K1K 3B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 968 St. Laurent Blvd
Ottawa ON K1K 3B3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2330 Carling Ave
Carlingview Manor Nursing Home
Ottawa ON K2B 7H1
Phone: 6138209328
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Aird Place
Ottawa Ontario K2L 4H8
Phone: 1-613-254-9702
Fax: 1-613-254-9743

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Mar 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Omar Alsaffar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Alsaffar (CPSO#: 124621 )
Business Address: 968 St. Laurent Blvd
Ottawa ON K1K 3B3
613 789 4385

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMAR KAMIL JACK ALSAFFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSAFFAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMAR KAMIL JACK ALSAFFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSAFFAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2021