THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:08:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre 1 Hospital Drive
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-743-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 06 May 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 06 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. JAFROODIFAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jafroodifar (CPSO#: 124625 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre 1 Hospital Drive
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-743-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 06 May 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 06 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. JAFROODIFAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jafroodifar (CPSO#: 124625 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABTIN JAFROODIFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAFROODIFAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABTIN JAFROODIFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAFROODIFAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023