THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:10:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: Iragunima, Faustin Ene-Owaji (Used Until: 09 Oct 2020)
Medical School: University of Port Harcourt, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 51 Benton St
Kitchener ON N2G 3H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: FAUSTIN SOLOMON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Solomon (CPSO#: 124687 )
Business Address: 51 Benton St
Kitchener ON N2G 3H1
Business Address: 51 Benton St
Kitchener ON N2G 3H1

General Information

Former Name: Iragunima, Faustin Ene-Owaji (Used Until: 09 Oct 2020)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Port Harcourt, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 51 Benton St
Kitchener ON N2G 3H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: FAUSTIN SOLOMON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Solomon (CPSO#: 124687 )
Business Address: 51 Benton St
Kitchener ON N2G 3H1
Business Address: 51 Benton St
Kitchener ON N2G 3H1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAUSTIN ENE SOLOMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLOMON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAUSTIN ENE SOLOMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLOMON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Port Harcourt, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2021