THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:35:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Faculdade De Ciencias Medicas Da Sta: Ca, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 339-291 Windermere Rd
University Hospital / Anesthesia Department
London ON N6G 2J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Avenida Albert Einstein, 627
São Paulo SP Brazil 05652-900
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Dec 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. H. TACHIBANA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tachibana (CPSO#: 124712 )
Business Address: 701-549 Fanshawe Park Road West
701-549 Fanshawe Park Road West
London Ontario N6G
6478711918

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Faculdade De Ciencias Medicas Da Sta: Ca, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 339-291 Windermere Rd
University Hospital / Anesthesia Department
London ON N6G 2J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Avenida Albert Einstein, 627
São Paulo SP Brazil 05652-900
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Dec 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. H. TACHIBANA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tachibana (CPSO#: 124712 )
Business Address: 701-549 Fanshawe Park Road West
701-549 Fanshawe Park Road West
London Ontario N6G
6478711918

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Mar 2025
30 Jun 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 01 2025
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. RICARDO HIDEO TACHIBANA may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Anesthesia & Perioperative Medicine, Western University, in which Dr. TACHIBANA holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. TACHIBANA no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. TACHIBANA’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. TACHIBANA’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 December, 2023, and expires on 30 June, 2028. Upon renewal of Dr. TACHIBANA's academic appointment at Western University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. RICARDO HIDEO TACHIBANA may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Anesthesia & Perioperative Medicine, Western University, in which Dr. TACHIBANA holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. TACHIBANA no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. TACHIBANA’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. TACHIBANA’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 December, 2023, and expires on 30 June, 2028. Upon renewal of Dr. TACHIBANA's academic appointment at Western University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Faculdade De Ciencias Medicas Da Sta: Ca, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2028
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2028

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2021