THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:00:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, KURDI, TURKISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1400 Provincial Rd
Windsor ON N8W 5W1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 216-8966
Fax: (519) 419-1337

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ammar Alfiya Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Alfiya (CPSO#: 124754 )
Business Address: 1400 Provincial Rd
Windsor ON N8W 5W1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, KURDI, TURKISH
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1400 Provincial Rd
Windsor ON N8W 5W1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 216-8966
Fax: (519) 419-1337

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ammar Alfiya Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Alfiya (CPSO#: 124754 )
Business Address: 1400 Provincial Rd
Windsor ON N8W 5W1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMMAR JAMEEL ALFIYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALFIYA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMMAR JAMEEL ALFIYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALFIYA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Feb 2021