THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:24:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Hadassah Medical School, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Health Sciences Centre
Division of Gynecologic Oncology
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 17 Jun 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Gynecologic Oncology
Effective: 17 Jun 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Salman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Salman (CPSO#: 124912 )
Business Address: Victoria Hospital Entry
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6C

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Hadassah Medical School, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Health Sciences Centre
Division of Gynecologic Oncology
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 17 Jun 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Gynecologic Oncology
Effective: 17 Jun 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Salman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Salman (CPSO#: 124912 )
Business Address: Victoria Hospital Entry
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6C

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
17 Jun 2024
30 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 17 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. LINA SALMAN may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Obstetrics & Gynaecology, Division of Gynecologic Oncology, Schulich School of Medicine & Dentistry, Western University, in which Dr. SALMAN holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. SALMAN no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. SALMAN’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. SALMAN’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 17 June, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. SALMAN's academic appointment at the Schulich School of Medicine & Dentistry, Western University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. LINA SALMAN may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Obstetrics & Gynaecology, Division of Gynecologic Oncology, Schulich School of Medicine & Dentistry, Western University, in which Dr. SALMAN holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. SALMAN no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. SALMAN’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. SALMAN’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 17 June, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. SALMAN's academic appointment at the Schulich School of Medicine & Dentistry, Western University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Hadassah Medical School, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2021