THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:17:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Lagos, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 250 Argyle Street North
Argyle Medical Clinic
Unit 1
Caledonia Ontario N3W 1K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-7655245
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 May 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Ogbunando Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ogbunando (CPSO#: 124934 )
Business Address: 2727 Courtice Rd
Unit B7
Halo Medical Clinic
Courtice ON L1E 3A2
905-233-1919
Business Address: 250 Argyle Street North
Argyle Medical Clinic
Unit 1
Caledonia Ontario N3W 1K9
905-7655245

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Lagos, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 250 Argyle Street North
Argyle Medical Clinic
Unit 1
Caledonia Ontario N3W 1K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-7655245
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 May 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Ogbunando Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ogbunando (CPSO#: 124934 )
Business Address: 2727 Courtice Rd
Unit B7
Halo Medical Clinic
Courtice ON L1E 3A2
905-233-1919
Business Address: 250 Argyle Street North
Argyle Medical Clinic
Unit 1
Caledonia Ontario N3W 1K9
905-7655245

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHUKWUEMEKA EMMANUEL OGBUNANDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OGBUNANDO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHUKWUEMEKA EMMANUEL OGBUNANDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OGBUNANDO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Lagos, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2021