THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:30:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Birmingham, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Polyclinic Family and Specialty Medicine Facility
A4-2 Champagne Dr
North York ON M3J 0K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Apr 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 13 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mankaryous Health Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Mankaryous (CPSO#: 125001 )
Business Address: 2 Champagne Dr
North York ON M3J 0K2
4162226061 Extn: 244

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Birmingham, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Polyclinic Family and Specialty Medicine Facility
A4-2 Champagne Dr
North York ON M3J 0K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Apr 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 13 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mankaryous Health Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Mankaryous (CPSO#: 125001 )
Business Address: 2 Champagne Dr
North York ON M3J 0K2
4162226061 Extn: 244

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE MANKARYOUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANKARYOUS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE MANKARYOUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANKARYOUS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Birmingham, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 2021