THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:53:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: Okoh, Brenda Omoro (Used Until: 23 Oct 2020)
Medical School: Ambrose Alli University College of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 411 Bayfield Street
TrueMedica Health Clinic
Unit B12
Barrie Ontario L4M 5E5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-252-8181
Fax: 705-252-8781

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: BRENDA IGBEYI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Igbeyi (CPSO#: 125065 )
Business Address: 535 Mulock Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 5H2
905-727-4241

General Information

Former Name: Okoh, Brenda Omoro (Used Until: 23 Oct 2020)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ambrose Alli University College of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 411 Bayfield Street
TrueMedica Health Clinic
Unit B12
Barrie Ontario L4M 5E5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-252-8181
Fax: 705-252-8781

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: BRENDA IGBEYI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Igbeyi (CPSO#: 125065 )
Business Address: 535 Mulock Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 5H2
905-727-4241

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRENDA OMORO IGBEYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IGBEYI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRENDA OMORO IGBEYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IGBEYI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ambrose Alli University College of Medicine, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2021