THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:11:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: Mobin, Romana (Used Until: 01 Dec 2020) Mobin, Romana (Used Until: 04 Nov 2020)
Medical School: Deccan College of Medical Sciences, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 505-2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058281027
Fax: 9058281509

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Apr 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 07 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Romana Khalid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Khalid (CPSO#: 125089 )
Business Address: 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Unit 505
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8

General Information

Former Name: Mobin, Romana (Used Until: 01 Dec 2020) Mobin, Romana (Used Until: 04 Nov 2020)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Deccan College of Medical Sciences, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 505-2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058281027
Fax: 9058281509

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Apr 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 07 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Romana Khalid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Khalid (CPSO#: 125089 )
Business Address: 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Unit 505
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROMANA KHALID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALID is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROMANA KHALID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALID is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Deccan College of Medical Sciences, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2021