THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 03:45:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond St
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 31 Mar 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 31 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sally Bogoch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bogoch (CPSO#: 125097 )
Business Address: 781 Markham St
-
-
-
Toronto ON M6G 2M4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond St
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 31 Mar 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 31 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sally Bogoch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bogoch (CPSO#: 125097 )
Business Address: 781 Markham St
-
-
-
Toronto ON M6G 2M4

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
28 Oct 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 28 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SALLY HANNA BOGOCH may practise medicine independently in emergency medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SALLY HANNA BOGOCH may practise medicine independently in emergency medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 28 Oct 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 May 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 May 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 May 2021