THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:29:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6-210 Kortright Road West
Guelph Ontario N1G 4X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-838-7122
Fax: 519-340-6826

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ISAAC SALIB MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Salib (CPSO#: 126382 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6-210 Kortright Road West
Guelph Ontario N1G 4X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-838-7122
Fax: 519-340-6826

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ISAAC SALIB MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Salib (CPSO#: 126382 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ISAAC NAGY IBRAHIM SALIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALIB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ISAAC NAGY IBRAHIM SALIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALIB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 17 Sep 2024
Summary of Decision:
On September 17, 2024, the Tribunal found that Dr. Salib engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by engaging in a hug with Patient A, which included the following elements, making Patient A feel uncomfortable:

Dr. Salib positioned his arms around Patient A, underneath her armpits, with her arms on his shoulders. She felt that Dr. Salib's hold on her was tight and too close. During the hug, Dr. Salib put his hand around Patient A’s waist. Patient A felt that Dr. Salib’s face was too close to her jaw and neck.

The Tribunal ordered that:  
  1. Dr. Salib attend before the panel to be reprimanded; 
  2. the Registrar suspend Dr. Salib’s certificate of registration for two (2) months commencing October 1, 2024 at 12:01 a.m.; 
  3. the Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Salib’s certificate of registration; 
  4. Dr. Salib pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by October 17, 2024.  
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected].
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
For more details please visit the OPSDT website

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 17 Sep 2024
Summary of Decision:
On September 17, 2024, the Tribunal found that Dr. Salib engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by engaging in a hug with Patient A, which included the following elements, making Patient A feel uncomfortable:

Dr. Salib positioned his arms around Patient A, underneath her armpits, with her arms on his shoulders. She felt that Dr. Salib's hold on her was tight and too close. During the hug, Dr. Salib put his hand around Patient A’s waist. Patient A felt that Dr. Salib’s face was too close to her jaw and neck.

The Tribunal ordered that:  
  1. Dr. Salib attend before the panel to be reprimanded; 
  2. the Registrar suspend Dr. Salib’s certificate of registration for two (2) months commencing October 1, 2024 at 12:01 a.m.; 
  3. the Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Salib’s certificate of registration; 
  4. Dr. Salib pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by October 17, 2024.  
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected].
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
For more details please visit the OPSDT website

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2024
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 01 Dec 2024
Suspension of registration imposed: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal Effective: 01 Oct 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2024

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2024

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2021